US HB638 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 158.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 158.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Wildlife Refuge Review Act of 2013 - Amends the National Wildlife Refuge System Administration Act of 1966 to prohibit the Secretary of the Interior from establishing any new national wildlife refuges, except as expressly authorized by a law enacted after January 3, 2013.
Title
National Wildlife Refuge Review Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL] |
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 158. |
2013-09-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-218. |
2013-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 12. |
2013-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-24 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2013-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2013-02-13 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E140-141) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3409 (Related) 2014-07-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats