US HB637 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - COSPONSOR AUTHORITY - Mr. Paulsen asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 637, a bill originally introduced by Rep. Schock of Illinois, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - COSPONSOR AUTHORITY - Mr. Paulsen asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 637, a bill originally introduced by Rep. Schock of Illinois, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent IRA Charitable Contribution Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the exclusion from gross income of distributions from individual retirement accounts made for charitable purposes. (Sec. 3) This provision exempts the budgetary effects of this Act from entry on PAYGO scorecards under the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010.
Title
Permanent IRA Charitable Contribution Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | COSPONSOR AUTHORITY - Mr. Paulsen asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 637, a bill originally introduced by Rep. Schock of Illinois, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection. |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 14. |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee on the Budget discharged. |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-20, Part I. |
2015-02-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 14. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |