US HB6334 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations.
Pending: House Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Securing America From Epidemics Act This bill authorizes the United States to participate in the Coalition for Epidemic Preparedness Innovations (CEPI), an alliance of countries and private partners whose mission is to finance and coordinate the development of vaccines for high-priority, epidemic-potential threats. The President must submit a report outlining (1) planned U.S. contributions to, and participation in, CEPI; (2) the manner and extent to which the United States shall participate in the governance of CEPI; and (3) how participation in CEPI supports U.S. government strategies and programs in health security and biodefense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Securing America From Epidemics Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations.
2020-03-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2020-03-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6800 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 455.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback