US HB6324 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes requirements for, and revises components of, loan programs of the Small Business Administration (SBA) to provide economic relief to small businesses affected by COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Specifically, the SBA must waive the requirement that small businesses affected by COVID-19 be unable to find credit elsewhere in order to be eligible for SBA loans, and it must provide loans made in response to COVID-19 at no interest rate. In addition, the SBA is authorized to temporarily defer payments on any SBA loan for a small business that is affected by COVID-19. During the period from January 31, 2020, and ending on December 31, 2020, eligible small businesses that apply for an emergency disaster loan in response to COVID-19 may request that the SBA provide an advance of up to $15,000 within three days of receiving the application. Such advance may be used for any allowable purpose, including (1) providing paid sick leave to employees who are unable to work due to direct effects of COVID-19, (2) maintaining payroll to retain employees during business disruptions or substantial shutdowns, and (3) making rent or mortgage payments. Applicants shall not be required to repay any amounts of such advance, even if they are subsequently denied an emergency disaster loan. Further, under certain conditions, such advance may also be taken into consideration when determining forgiveness for a loan to meet payroll costs.
Title
Too Small to Fail Act
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2020-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee leave
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Small business
Wages and earnings
Commerce
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee leave
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Small business
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6324/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6324/BILLS-116hr6324ih.pdf |