US HB6303 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-01 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-01 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To designate facilities of the United States Postal Service, to establish new ZIP Codes, and for other purposes.
Title
To designate facilities of the United States Postal Service, to establish new ZIP Codes, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H7008-7009) |
2016-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6303. |
2016-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7008-7010) |
2016-11-30 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-11-30 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 160. |
2016-11-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-843. |
2016-11-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-11-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-11-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-11-14 | House | Introduced in House |