US HB630 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent S Corporation Charitable Contribution Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the tax rule that reduces the basis of the stock of an S corporation shareholder by the adjusted basis (rather than fair market value) of any charitable contribution made by the S corporation.
Title
Permanent S Corporation Charitable Contribution Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 10. |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-16. |
2015-02-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 14. |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2788 (Related) 2015-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Capital gains tax
Charitable contributions
Securities
Small business
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Capital gains tax
Charitable contributions
Securities
Small business
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation