US HB6285 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To ratify and approve all authorizations, permits, verifications, extensions, biological opinions, incidental take statements, and any other approvals or orders issued pursuant to Federal law necessary for the establishment and administration of the Coastal Plain oil and gas leasing program, and for other purposes.
Title
Alaska’s Right to Produce Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Mary Peltola [D-AK] | Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] | Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] |
Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
Rep. Eric Burlison [R-MO] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - On Passage RC# 174 (Y: 214 N: 199 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - On Motion to Recommit RC# 173 (Y: 201 N: 211 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2024-05-01 - House - On Motion to Recommit RC# 173 (Y: 201 N: 211 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2024-05-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-05-01 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 214 - 199, 2 Present (Roll no. 174). (text: CR H2804-2805) |
2024-05-01 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 201 - 211 (Roll no. 173). |
2024-05-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2814-2816) |
2024-05-01 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 6285, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Castor (FL) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2024-05-01 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2024-05-01 | House | Ms. Castor (FL) moved to recommit to the Committee on Natural Resources. (text: CR H2813-2814) |
2024-05-01 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1173, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Stauber amendment No. 1. |
2024-05-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6285. |
2024-05-01 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, H.R. 6285 and H.R. 6090. The rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, and H.R. 6090 under a closed rule, and H.R. 6285 under a structured rule. The rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each bill. |
2024-05-01 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1173. (consideration: CR H2804-2814) |
2024-04-29 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1173 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, H.R. 6285 and H.R. 6090. The rule provides for consideration of H.R. 615, H.R. 2925, H.R. 3195, H.R. 764, H.R. 3397, and H.R. 6090 under a closed rule, and H.R. 6285 under a structured rule. The rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each bill. |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 384. |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-463. |
2023-12-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 17. |
2023-12-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-12-06 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged |
2023-11-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-11-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2023-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3289 (Same As) 2023-11-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HR1173 (Related) 2024-04-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8214 (Related) 2024-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HR1173 (Related) 2024-04-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8214 (Related) 2024-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.