US HB6278 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-328.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-328.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kingman and Heritage Islands Act of 2010 - Amends the National Children's Island Act of 1995 to allow the District of Columbia to use the lands conveyed (Kingman and Heritage Islands) and the related easements granted under such Act for recreational, environmental, or educational purposes in accordance with a specified Anacostia Waterfront Framework Plan and a Comprehensive Plan. (Thus expands allowable uses for them by the District.) Revises the terms of the reversionary interest of the United States in such properties and easements. Repeals the conditions for reversion with respect to: (1) failure to commence improvements in or operation of the recreational park; or (2) abandonment or nonuse of the park after completion of construction and commencement of operation. States that title in the Islands and the related easements shall revert back to the United States 60 days after the Secretary of Interior notifies the District in writing that the District is not using any part of the conveyed property for recreational, environmental, or educational purposes in accordance with the National Children's Island, the Anacostia Waterfront Framework Plan, or the Comprehensive Plan.
Title
Kingman and Heritage Islands Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-22 | Became Public Law No: 111-328. | |
2010-12-22 | Signed by President. | |
2010-12-17 | Presented to President. | |
2010-12-14 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-12-13 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-12-13 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8960-8961) | |
2010-11-17 | Received in the Senate, read twice. | |
2010-11-16 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-11-16 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7464) | |
2010-11-16 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6278. | |
2010-11-16 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7464-7465) | |
2010-11-16 | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2010-09-29 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2092 (Related) 2010-09-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
District of Columbia
Government operations and politics
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Government operations and politics
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation