US HB626 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Seniors' Rights to Know Act Amends title XVIII (Medicare) part C (Medicare+Choice) of the Social Security Act to require the information the Secretary of Health and Human Services provides to promote informed choice on available part C coverage options to describe the changes for the plan year made by a Medicare Advantage (MA) organization, with respect to the MA plan it offers, pursuant to the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010. Allows such information to assess the effect of such provisions and amendments on MA-eligible individuals who enroll under the plan. Prohibits the Secretary from disapproving the inclusion of any such information in marketing materials or application forms unless it is factually inaccurate for the plan year for which the information is provided or any preceding plan year beginning after March 23, 2010.
Title
Seniors' Rights to Know Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Consumer affairs
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Marketing and advertising
Medicare
Consumer affairs
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Marketing and advertising
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/626/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr626/BILLS-114hr626ih.pdf |