US HB6256 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-78.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-78.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that goods made with forced labor in the Xinjiang Uyghur Autonomous Region of the People’s Republic of China do not enter the United States market, and for other purposes.
Title
To ensure that goods made with forced labor in the Xinjiang Uyghur Autonomous Region of the People’s Republic of China do not enter the United States market, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-23 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-78. |
2021-12-23 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-12-20 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9231) |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2021-12-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-12-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7804-7806) |
2021-12-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6256. |
2021-12-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7804-7808) |
2021-12-14 | House | Mr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-12-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-12-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB65 (Related) 2021-07-16 - Held at the desk.