US HB6227 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Quantum Initiative Act This bill directs the President to implement a National Quantum Initiative Program to, among other things, establish the goals and priorities for a 10-year plan to accelerate the development of quantum information science and technology applications. The bill defines "quantum information science" as the storage, transmission, manipulation, or measurement of information that is encoded in systems that can only be described by the laws of quantum physics. The National Science and Technology Council shall establish a Subcommittee on Quantum Information Science, including membership from the National Institute of Standards and Technology (NIST) and the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA), to guide program activities. The President must establish a National Quantum Initiative Advisory Committee to advise the President and subcommittee on quantum information science and technology research and development. NIST shall carry out specified quantum science activities and convene a workshop to discuss the development of a quantum information science and technology industry. The National Science Foundation shall: carry out a basic research and education program on quantum information science and engineering, and award grants for the establishment of Multidisciplinary Centers for Quantum Research and Education. The Department of Energy (DOE) shall carry out a basic research program on quantum information science. The Office of Science of DOE shall establish and operate National Quantum Information Science Research Centers to conduct basic research to accelerate scientific breakthroughs in quantum information science and technology.
Title
National Quantum Initiative Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - House - On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment RC# 442 (Y: 348 N: 11 NV: 73 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 348 - 11 (Roll no. 442). (text: CR H10298-10300) |
2018-12-19 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Smith (TX) objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 6227. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Mr. Smith (TX) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10297-10302, H10317-10318) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | S.Amdt.4114 Amendment SA 4114 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | S.Amdt.4114 Amendment SA 4114 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Thune. In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7625) |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2018-09-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8229-8231) |
2018-09-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6227. |
2018-09-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8229-8234) |
2018-09-13 | House | Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 740. |
2018-09-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-950. |
2018-06-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-06-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2018-06-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3143 (Related) 2018-11-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 676.