US HB6219 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Georgia Support Act
Title
Georgia Support Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2018-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-12 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10140-10141) |
2018-12-12 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10140-10141) |
2018-12-12 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2018-12-12 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2018-12-12 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2018-12-12 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-07-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2018-07-18 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6473) |
2018-06-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Asia
Computer security and identity theft
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign property
Free trade and trade barriers
Georgia (Republic)
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
News media and reporting
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade agreements and negotiations
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
Computer security and identity theft
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign property
Free trade and trade barriers
Georgia (Republic)
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
News media and reporting
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade agreements and negotiations
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers