US HB6197 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
RAWR Act Rescuing Animals With Rewards Act of 2018
Title
RAWR Act Rescuing Animals With Rewards Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2018-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8155) |
2018-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6197. |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8155-8157) |
2018-09-12 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-06-28 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-06-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-06-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2018-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Endangered and threatened species
International affairs
Organized crime
Smuggling and trafficking
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Endangered and threatened species
International affairs
Organized crime
Smuggling and trafficking
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection