US HB6181 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 431.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 431.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reaffirm that certain land has been taken into trust for the benefit of the Samish Indian Nation, and for other purposes.
Title
Samish Indian Nation Land Reaffirmation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 431. |
2022-12-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-598. |
2022-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 18. |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-15 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2022-04-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-12-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-12-08 | House | Introduced in House |