US HB6169 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disaster Housing Assistance Act This bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to enter into an agreement or agreements with the Department of Housing and Urban Development to establish a temporary program that provides long-term rental housing assistance to eligible families affected by a major disaster during 2017, including with respect to Hurricane Maria. The Government Accountability Office shall report to Congress by January 20, 2020, on results of the program.
Title
Disaster Housing Assistance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2018-06-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-06-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2880 (Same As) 2018-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6169/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6169/BILLS-115hr6169ih.pdf |