US HB6168 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-178. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-178. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs to increase, as of December 1, 2020, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children. The percentage increase in benefits shall be the same as the cost-of-living increase for Social Security recipients.
Title
Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-178. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-10-09 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5882) |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-05-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-05-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2327) |
2020-05-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6168. |
2020-05-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2327-2328) |
2020-05-28 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1200 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-58. (TXT | PDF)
SB2072 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB4579 (Same As) 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2072 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB4579 (Same As) 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation