US HB6146 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cottonwood Land Exchange Act of 2018
Title
Cottonwood Land Exchange Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9483-9484) |
2018-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6146. |
2018-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9483-9484) |
2018-11-13 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-08-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 692. |
2018-08-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-895. |
2018-07-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-18 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-07-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-06-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-06-19 | House | Introduced in House |