US HB6144 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To delay and offset the sequester to occur in January 2022 under the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, and for other purposes.
Title
Removing Waste and Protecting Medicare Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2022-01-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations. |
2021-12-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-12-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Agriculture, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-12-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6143 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3344 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3344 (Related) 2021-12-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6144/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6144/BILLS-117hr6144ih.pdf |