US HB6142 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Rural Electrification Act of 1936 to establish a last acre program, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LAST ACRE Act of 2023 Linking Access to Spur Technology for Agriculture Connectivity in Rural Environments Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development.
2024-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology.
2023-11-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2023-11-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-11-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2542 (Related) 2023-07-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback