US HB614 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Shark Sales Elimination Act of 2019 This bill makes it illegal to possess, buy, or sell shark parts or any product containing shark parts. A person may possess a shark part that was lawfully taken consistent with a license or permit under certain circumstances. Penalties are imposed for violations under the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shark Sales Elimination Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-01-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB737 (Related) 2019-09-18 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 13.
SB877 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback