US HB6133 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

STEP Improvement Act of 2020 This bill reauthorizes through FY2024 the Small Business Administration's (SBA) State Trade Expansion Program, which provides foreign trade assistance to small businesses, and it revises provisions related to the administration of the program. Specifically, the SBA must establish a time frame for, and provide certain information related to, the application process, and it must conduct an annual survey to solicit feedback on the program. The SBA must collect data on certain performance metrics such as the (1) total number of small businesses assisted by the program, (2) total dollar amount of export sales by participating small businesses, and (3) number of small businesses that have created new jobs through their participation in the program. The bill also requires applicants for participation to include a budget plan that outlines their intended use of funds awarded under the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STEP Improvement Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
2020-09-14HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-14HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4341-4342)
2020-09-14HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6133.
2020-09-14HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4341-4344)
2020-09-14HouseMs. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2020-03-11HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2020-03-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
2020-03-09HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback