US HB6130 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-308.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-308.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Holocaust Expropriated Art Recovery Act of 2016 (Sec. 5) This bill allows civil claims or causes of action for the recovery of artwork or certain other property lost between January 1, 1933, and December 31, 1945, because of Nazi persecution to be commenced within six years after the claimant's actual discovery of: (1) the identity and location of the artwork or other property, and (2) a possessory interest in the artwork or property. Such statutory limitation period of six years after actual discovery preempts any other statutes of limitation or defenses relating to the passage of time. Preexisting claims known by a claimant before enactment of this bill shall be considered discovered on the date of this bill's enactment if they were barred before, or not barred on, the date of enactment. This bill applies to claims or actions that are: (1) pending on the date of this bill's enactment, including an action for which the time to file an appeal has not expired; or (2) filed after enactment but before 2027. But the bill does not apply to claims barred on the day before enactment of this bill if: (1) the claimant had knowledge on or after January 1, 1999, and (2) six years have passed from the date such claimant acquired such knowledge and during which time the claim was not barred by a statute of limitations.
Title
Holocaust Expropriated Art Recovery Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-308. |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7128-7131) |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7330-7331) |
2016-12-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6130. |
2016-12-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7330-7333) |
2016-12-07 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-10-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2016-09-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2016-09-22 | House | Introduced in House |