US HB6119 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-03 - Became Public Law No: 117-70.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-03 - Became Public Law No: 117-70.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Making further continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for other purposes.
Title
Further Extending Government Funding Act Additional Afghanistan Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2022 Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Passed Senate, under the order of 12/2/2021, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Amendment SA 4868 S.Amdt.4868 (Y: 48 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-12-02 - House - On passage (Y: 221 N: 212 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - On motion to table the motion to reconsider (Y: 217 N: 209 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 211 N: 219 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Amendment SA 4868 S.Amdt.4868 (Y: 48 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-12-02 - House - On passage (Y: 221 N: 212 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - On motion to table the motion to reconsider (Y: 217 N: 209 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 211 N: 219 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-03 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-70. |
2021-12-03 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-12-03 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-12-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, under the order of 12/2/2021, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 69 - 28. Record Vote Number: 477. |
2021-12-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table. |
2021-12-02 | House | On motion to table the motion to reconsider Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 217 - 209 (Roll no. 400). |
2021-12-02 | House | Ms. DeLauro moved to table the motion to reconsider |
2021-12-02 | House | Mr. Evans moved to reconsider. |
2021-12-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table. Objection heard. |
2021-12-02 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 212 (Roll no. 399). (text: CR H6872-6873) |
2021-12-02 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 211 - 219 (Roll no. 398). |
2021-12-02 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2021-12-02 | House | Mr. Calvert moved to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations. (text: CR H6889) |
2021-12-02 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-12-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6119. |
2021-12-02 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6119 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit allowed. Rule provides for suspension authority through January 21, 2021. |
2021-12-02 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 829. (consideration: CR H6872-6891) |
2021-12-02 | House | Rule H. Res. 829 passed House. |
2021-12-02 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 829 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6119 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit allowed. Rule provides for suspension authority through January 21, 2021. |
2021-12-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.4868 Amendment SA 4868 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 50. Record Vote Number: 476. |
2021-12-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.4868 Amendment SA 4868 proposed by Senator Marshall. (consideration: CR S8905-8906; text: CR S8905) To prohibit the use of Federal funds for implementing or enforcing COVID-19 vaccine mandates. |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8904-8906) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2021-12-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-12-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR829 (Related) 2021-12-02 - On motion to table the motion to reconsider Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 217 - 202 (Roll no. 397).
HB2430 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2630 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2430 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2630 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.