US HB6111 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
I-14 Expansion and Improvement Act of 2018
Title
I-14 Expansion and Improvement Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] |
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2018-06-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-06-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4823 (Related) 2018-01-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB531 (Related) 2017-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB531 (Related) 2017-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6111/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6111/BILLS-115hr6111ih.pdf |