US HB6089 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 49-29)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Hearing: May 26 @ 11:00 am in S-116
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expands existing provisions requiring sanctions against individuals or entities that provide certain types of weapons to Iran. Specifically, the bill modifies the provisions by adding unmanned combat aerial vehicles to the list of weapons covered by the sanctions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stop Iranian Drones Act

Sponsors

Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX]Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX]
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA]Rep. Young Kim [R-CA]Rep. David Valadao [R-CA]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]
Rep. Patrick Fallon [R-TX]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI]Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY]
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ]Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]

Roll Calls

2022-04-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 424 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-28SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2022-04-27HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2022-04-27HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 2 (Roll no. 136). (text: CR H4545)
2022-04-27HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4559-4560)
2022-04-27HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2022-04-27HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6089.
2022-04-27HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4545-4547)
2022-04-27HouseMr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-12-10HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2021-12-10HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-12-09HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-11-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-11-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-11-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3421 (Related) 2021-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback