US HB6087 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend chapter 81 of title 5, United States Code, to cover, for purposes of workers’ compensation under such chapter, services by physician assistants and nurse practitioners provided to injured Federal workers, and for other purposes.
Title
Improving Access to Workers’ Compensation for Injured Federal Workers Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 325 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-06-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 325 - 83 (Roll no. 233). (text: CR H5242) |
2022-06-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5321-5322) |
2022-06-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-06-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6087. |
2022-06-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5242-5249) |
2022-06-07 | House | Mr. Courtney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-03-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote. |
2022-03-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-11-30 | House | Introduced in House |