US HB6084 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Improving Social Security's Service to Victims of Identity Theft Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving Social Security's Service to Victims of Identity Theft Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-25SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2018-07-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-24HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7113)
2018-07-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6084.
2018-07-24HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7113-7115)
2018-07-24HouseMr. Bishop (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-06-29HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 619.
2018-06-29HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-800.
2018-06-21HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2018-06-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-06-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
2018-06-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2018-06-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6559 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback