US HB6074 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Combating the Heroin Epidemic Through Forensic Drug Testing Act of 2018
Title
Combating the Heroin Epidemic Through Forensic Drug Testing Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-06-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1355 (Related) 2017-06-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2008 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2241 (Related) 2017-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2008 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2241 (Related) 2017-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Law enforcement administration and funding
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Law enforcement administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6074/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6074/BILLS-115hr6074ih.pdf |