US HB6070 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 777.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Military Lands Withdrawal Act of 1999 to clarify the authority of Department of Defense to conduct certain military activities at the Nevada test and training range, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend the Military Lands Withdrawal Act of 1999 to clarify the authority of Department of Defense to conduct certain military activities at the Nevada test and training range, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-19HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 777.
2024-12-19HouseCommittee on Armed Services discharged.
2024-11-18HouseHouse Committee on Armed Services Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 19, 2024.
2024-11-18HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-752, Part I.
2023-11-15HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2023-11-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-11-15HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged
2023-11-14HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held
2023-11-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2023-10-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-10-26HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback