US HB6064 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-289.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-289.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to seek to enter into an agreement with the National Academies of Sciences, Engineering, and Medicine for a review of examinations, furnished by the Secretary, to individuals who submit claims to the Secretary for compensation under chapter 11 of title 38, United States Code, for mental and physical conditions linked to military sexual trauma.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to seek to enter into an agreement with the National Academies of Sciences, Engineering, and Medicine for a review of examinations, furnished by the Secretary, to individuals who submit claims to the Secretary for compensation under chapter 11 of title 38, United States Code, for mental and physical conditions linked to military sexual trauma.
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] |
Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 414 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-289. |
2022-12-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7302) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-05-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 2 (Roll no. 217). (text: CR H5108-5109) |
2022-05-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5142-5143) |
2022-05-18 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-05-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6064. |
2022-05-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5108-5109) |
2022-05-18 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced in House |