US HB6060 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide outer burial receptacles for each new grave in cemeteries that are the subjects of certain grants made by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.
Title
Veterans Burial Benefit Correction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4419 (Related) 2020-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB4511 (Related) 2020-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4511 (Related) 2020-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6060/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6060/BILLS-116hr6060ih.pdf |