US HB6042 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-288.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-288.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 213 William Hilton Parkway in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina, as the "Casear H. Wright Jr. Post Office Building".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 213 William Hilton Parkway in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina, as the "Caesar H. Wright Jr. Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-288. |
2022-12-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7282-7283) |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-12-12 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9670) |
2022-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6042. |
2022-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: H9670-9671) |
2022-12-12 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced in House |