US HB6018 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Trans-Sahara Counterterrorism Partnership Act of 2018
Title
Trans-Sahara Counterterrorism Partnership Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2018-11-13 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9495-9496) |
2018-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6018. |
2018-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9495-9497) |
2018-11-13 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2018-06-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Africa
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
International affairs
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
Political movements and philosophies
Rule of law and government transparency
Terrorism
Youth employment and child labor
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
International affairs
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
Political movements and philosophies
Rule of law and government transparency
Terrorism
Youth employment and child labor