US HB6013 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Migratory Bird Framework and Hunting Opportunities for Veterans Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Migratory Bird Treaty Act to revise requirements for hunting ducks, mergansers, and coots. Specifically, the bill establishes January 31 of each year as the closing date of the hunting season for ducks, mergansers, and coots. In addition, the bill extends the hunting season for those birds by an extra weekend for youths, veterans, and members of the Armed Forces on active duty. The extra days for youth m The Department of the Interior may not decrease the length of the hunting season or bag limit, as compared to the 2017-2018 hunting season, in the Atlantic, Mississippi, Central, or Pacific flyway.
Title
Migratory Bird Framework and Hunting Opportunities for Veterans Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2018-09-25 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8853-8854) |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6013. |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8853-8854) |
2018-09-25 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 757. |
2018-09-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-969. |
2018-09-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-09-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-05 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-07-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-06-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2942 (Same As) 2018-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Animals
Birds
Department of the Interior
Hunting and fishing
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animals
Birds
Department of the Interior
Hunting and fishing
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection