US HB601 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a new, separate registration process for manufacturers of cannabis for research. As a part of this process, the Drug Enforcement Administration must annually assess whether there is an adequate and uninterrupted supply of research cannabis and register additional manufacturers. The bill also authorizes health care providers of the Department of Veterans Affairs to provide information to veterans regarding participation in federally approved cannabis clinical trials.
Title
Medical Cannabis Research Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] |
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Medical research
Veterans' medical care
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Medical research
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/601/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr601/BILLS-116hr601ih.pdf |