US HB5995 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-260.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-260.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
GAO Civilian Task and Delivery Order Protest Authority Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill makes permanent the Government Accountability Office's (GAO's) authority to hear a contractor's protest regarding the issuance or proposed issuance of a civilian federal agency's task or delivery order contract for the procurement of services or property valued in excess of $10 million. (Under current law, the GAO's jurisdiction over protests relating to federal defense contracts is already permanent, but the protest authority for civilian federal agency contracts is scheduled to expire after September 30, 2016.)
Title
GAO Civilian Task and Delivery Order Protest Authority Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-260. |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6627) |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5745) |
2016-09-21 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5745) |
2016-09-21 | House | Mr. Meadows asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2016-09-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 608. |
2016-09-21 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-779. |
2016-09-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-09-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-09-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |