US HB598 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Georgia Support Act This bill directs the Department of State to report to Congress on various topics related to Georgia. The reports shall cover (1) U.S. security assistance to Georgia and an assessment of threats to the country's independence and its ability to defend itself, (2) cybersecurity cooperation between the United States and Georgia, and (3) a strategy to help Georgia expand its capabilities to combat Russian disinformation and propaganda. The President shall impose entry and property-blocking sanctions against foreign persons responsible for or complicit in serious human rights abuses in the Georgian regions of Abkhazia and Tskhinvali Region/South Ossetia that are occupied by Russia. The President shall also report to Congress every 180 days on such foreign persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Support Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-10-22HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-10-22HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8358-8360)
2019-10-22HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 598.
2019-10-22HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8358-8362)
2019-10-22HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-05-22HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-05-22HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-05-22HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-01-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback