US HB5979 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 664.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 664.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mill Springs Battlefield National Monument Act This bill establishes the Mill Springs Battlefield National Monument in Kentucky as a unit of the National Park System to preserve and interpret the nationally significant historic resources of the Mill Springs Battlefield and its role in the Civil War. No private property or nonfederal public property shall be managed as a part of the monument without the owner's written consent.
Title
Mill Springs Battlefield National Monument Act
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 664. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-378. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6627) |
2018-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5979. |
2018-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6627-6628) |
2018-07-23 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 662. |
2018-07-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-855. |
2018-07-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-18 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-07-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-06-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3176 (Related) 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.