US HB5951 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Agriculture to establish and maintain a training program for Department of Agriculture personnel and third-party providers on the rapidly evolving methodologies, science, and practices of biological soil health management systems on agricultural land, and for other purposes.
Title
Soil CARE Act of 2023 Soil Conservation And Regeneration Education Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Andrea Salinas [D-OR] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Val Hoyle [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology. |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2023-10-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3023 (Same As) 2023-10-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5951/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5951/BILLS-118hr5951ih.pdf |