US HB5938 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Serving Veterans Act of 2018 This bill amends the VA Choice and Quality Employment Act to name the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) recruiting database the Departments of Defense and Veterans Affairs Recruitment Database and require that it includes for each vacant position: the military occupational specialty or skill corresponding to the VA position, and each qualified U.S. Armed Forces active-duty member (who elects to be listed in the database) who may be recruited to fill the position. The database shall include the following for each qualified member of the Armed Forces: name, contact information, expected discharge date, and military occupational specialty. The VA shall implement direct hiring and appointment procedures for vacant database positions and may authorize relocation bonuses. The VA shall train and certify veterans who served as basic health care technicians in the Armed Forces to work as VA intermediate care technicians.
Title
Veterans Serving Veterans Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7142-7143) |
2018-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5938. |
2018-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7142-7144) |
2018-07-24 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 674. |
2018-07-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-871. |
2018-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |