US HB5937 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase language access to mental health services at certain health centers, and for other purposes.
Title
Mental Health Workforce and Language Access Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-11-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4677 (Related) 2022-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4677 (Related) 2022-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5937/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5937/BILLS-117hr5937ih.pdf |