US HB5935 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend chapter 44 of title 18, United States Code, to more comprehensively address the interstate transportation of firearms or ammunition.
Title
Lawful Interstate Transportation of Firearms Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] |
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] |
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] |
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB175 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3139 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3139 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Firearms and explosives
Legal fees and court costs
Motor vehicles
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Firearms and explosives
Legal fees and court costs
Motor vehicles
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5935/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5935/BILLS-116hr5935ih.pdf |