US HB5932 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Ensuring Chinese Debt Transparency Act of 2020 This bill states that it is U.S. policy to push for greater transparency with respect to financing provided by China to another country through international financial institutions such as the International Monetary Fund. The National Advisory Council on International Monetary and Financial Policies within the Department of the Treasury shall report annually on progress made toward advancing this policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring Chinese Debt Transparency Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 80 (Y: 356 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 73) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2020-03-02HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2020-03-02HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-03-02HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 356 - 0 (Roll no. 80). (text: CR H1429)
2020-03-02HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1433-1434)
2020-03-02HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-03-02HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5932.
2020-03-02HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1429-1430)
2020-03-02HouseMr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2020-02-28HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-02-28HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-02-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-02-21HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2020-02-21HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback