US HB5926 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to provide for expedient restoration of advanced communications service networks during times of emergency, and for other purposes.
Title
RESILIENT Networks Act Reinforcing and Evaluating Service Integrity, Local Infrastructure, and Emergency Notification for Today’s Networks Act
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Caribbean area
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency communications systems
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
First responders and emergency personnel
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Public utilities and utility rates
Puerto Rico
Science, technology, communications
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Caribbean area
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency communications systems
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
First responders and emergency personnel
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Public utilities and utility rates
Puerto Rico
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5926/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5926/BILLS-116hr5926ih.pdf |