US HB5922 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Food Security Act of 1985 to address emissions of certain greenhouse gasses and carbon storage through conservation incentive contracts.
Title
CROP for Farming Act Conservation and Regenerative Optimization Practices for Farming Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Sen. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology. |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2023-10-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2564 (Same As) 2023-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5922/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5922/BILLS-118hr5922ih.pdf |