US HB5920 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-3)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MONARCH Act of 2020 Monarch Action, Recovery, and Conservation of Habitat Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MONARCH Act of 2020 Monarch Action, Recovery, and Conservation of Habitat Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2020-02-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2020-02-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-02-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-02-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-02-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3304 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback