US HB5903 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on October 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 642.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 642.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the International Boundary and Water Commission to accept funds for activities relating to wastewater treatment and flood control works, and for other purposes.
Title
To authorize the International Boundary and Water Commission to accept funds for activities relating to wastewater treatment and flood control works, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. John Duarte [R-CA] |
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-11-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 642. |
2024-11-26 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 118-777. |
2023-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote. |
2023-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-15 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged |
2023-10-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2023-10-06 | House | Introduced in House |