US HB5887 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BIG Data for IP Act Building Innovation Growth through Data for Intellectual Property Act This bill amends the Leahy-Smith America Invents Act to extend for eight years the authority of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office to set and adjust patent fees.
Title
BIG Data for IP Act Building Innovation Growth through Data for Intellectual Property Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2018-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2601 (Related) 2018-04-18 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
SB3416 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3416 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Commerce
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Intellectual property
User charges and fees
Commerce
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Intellectual property
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5887/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5887/BILLS-115hr5887ih.pdf |