US HB5875 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act and the Dingell-Johnson Federal Aid in Sport Fish Restoration Act, to provide parity for United States territories and the District of Columbia, to make technical corrections to such Acts and related laws, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act and the Dingell-Johnson Federal Aid in Sport Fish Restoration Act, to provide parity for United States territories and the District of Columbia, to make technical corrections to such Acts and related laws, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2018-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6625-6626) |
2018-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5875. |
2018-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6625-6627) |
2018-07-23 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 621. |
2018-07-03 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-802. |
2018-06-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-06 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-05-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-05-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |