US HB5864 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
VA Hospitals Establishing Leadership Performance Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs: (1) the Department of Veterans Affairs to establish qualifications and related performance metrics for each human resources position within the Veterans Health Administration, and (2) the Government Accountability Office to report to Congress regarding the implementation and quality of such metrics and qualifications.
Title
VA Hospitals Establishing Leadership Performance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] |
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-25 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 374 (Y: 417 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 374). |
2018-07-25 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7199-7200) |
2018-07-24 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5864. |
2018-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7141-7142; text: CR H7141) |
2018-07-24 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 675. |
2018-07-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-872. |
2018-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2018-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-05-17 | House | Introduced in House |